+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as amended
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
October 19, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2868 PN 4543, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, BENNINGHOFF
October 19, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2868 PN 4543, FP
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor