+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to COMMERCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
October 19, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2862 PN 4375, FP
September 30, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2862 PN 4375, 2019 A7383, KRUEGER
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor