+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1491
- Third consideration and final passage (176-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1453
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Votes (2)
July 22, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 271 PN 2062, FP
July 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 271 PN 1882, 2015 A2735, TOPPER
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor