+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 23, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 87
- Approved by the Governor
On October 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 16, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 15, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4245
On October 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
On October 11, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (176-0)
- Remarks see House Journal Page
On October 10, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
October 17, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 270 PN 4245, FINAL PASSAGE
October 11, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 270 PN 4210, FP
October 10, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 270 PN 949, 2017 A10067, FARRY
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor