+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 264-267
- Third consideration and final passage (157-39)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 232-241
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 20, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, FP
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A202, MCCLINTON
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A203, MCCLINTON
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A196, RABB
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A192, HARRIS, J.
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A188, DAWKINS
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A194, HARRIS, J.
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A195, HARRIS, J.
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A197, HARRIS, J.
March 13, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A193, HARRIS, J.
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor