+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On July 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act No. 80 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On July 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 787-788
- Third consideration and final passage (46-4)
On July 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On June 27, 2022 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (170-30)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 20, 2022 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
July 7, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2679 PN 3252, Final Passage
June 27, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2679 PN 3252, FP
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor