+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 13, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor