+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 76
- Approved by the Governor
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1567-1568
- House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the Senate (197-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- In the House
- Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-0)
- Referred to RULES
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1428-1432
- House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (197-0)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
- Referred to RULES
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Remarks see House Journal Page 319-320
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- In the Senate
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
September 25, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 265 PN 2579, CONCUR
September 25, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 265 PN 2579, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED
June 28, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 265 PN 2286, CONCUR
June 28, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 265 PN 2241, 2019 A2629, DERMODY
June 27, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 265 PN 2241, FINAL PASSAGE
March 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 265 PN 236, FP
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor