+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 3, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 141 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (170-28)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (41-8)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 717-718
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
October 26, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2648 PN 3591, CONCURRENCE
October 26, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2648 PN 3591, Final Passage
June 22, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2648 PN 3201, FP
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor