+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 48
- Approved by the Governor
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (179-4)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 399-400
- Third consideration and final passage (198-3)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 353-354
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 264 PN 3367, CONCUR
June 6, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 264 PN 3367, FINAL PASSAGE
March 30, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 264 PN 695, FP
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor