+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 3, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 139 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3593
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 632-633
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 600-601
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 7, 2022 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
October 26, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2633 PN 3593, CONCURRENCE
October 25, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2633 PN 3593, Final Passage
June 15, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2633 PN 3243, FP
June 14, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2633 PN 3197, 2021 A4599
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor