+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 6, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (168-6)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 26 PN 41, FP
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor