+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On July 14, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (114-87)
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Vote
July 14, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2541 PN 3809, FP
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor