+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On November 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act No. 137 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On October 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
On October 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
On September 21, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On September 20, 2022 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 19, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 14, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES