+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 602-604
- Third consideration and final passage (112-88)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 568-572
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
June 14, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2524 PN 3235, FP
June 13, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2524 PN 3058, 2021 A4480
June 13, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2524 PN 3058, 2021 A4502
June 13, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2524 PN 3058, 2021 A4492
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor