+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 12, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 1, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 20, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor