+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On October 6, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 23, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 22, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 16, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
October 6, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2465 PN 4037, FP
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor