+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 23, 2020 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 887-888
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as amended
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2437 PN 3920, FP
June 9, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2437 PN 3851, 2019 A5987, STEPHENS
June 9, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2437 PN 3851, 2019 A5966, RYAN
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor