+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (193-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 4, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
June 11, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2420 PN 3516, FP
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor