+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 14, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 140
- Approved by the Governor
On October 7, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On September 22, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
On September 16, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (3)
October 6, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 241 PN 4153, CONCUR
September 24, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 241 PN 4153, FINAL PASSAGE
June 24, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 241 PN 254, FP
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor