+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 572-575
- Third consideration and final passage (125-75)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 537-538
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2404 PN 3204, FP
June 8, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 2404 PN 3135, 2021 A4385
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor