+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 63
- Approved by the Governor
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1937
- House concurred in Senate amendments (191-1)
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 499-500
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1073
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (4)
November 10, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 239 PN 2334, CONCUR
October 14, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 239 PN 2334, FINAL PASSAGE
April 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 239 PN 1238, FP
April 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 239 PN 1073, 2015 A598, FREEMAN
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor