+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On September 25, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 20, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On July 8, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (179-18)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
March 20, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 236 PN 202, FP
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor