+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 5, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 235 PN 1055, FP
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor