+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On September 23, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
- In the Senate
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
February 4, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 233 PN 203, FP
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor