+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 28, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Vote
October 18, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 2304 PN 3806, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor