+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 28, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On August 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
October 18, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 2293 PN 3777, FP
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor