+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On July 10, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 9A
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2287 PN 3618, FINAL PASSAGE
June 24, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2287 PN 3618, FP
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor