+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
May 22, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2256 PN 3321, FP
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor