+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 13A
- Approved by the Governor
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (195-3)
- In the Senate
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 414
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 22, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2244 PN 3750, FINAL PASSAGE
June 20, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2244 PN 3750, FP
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor