+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
- In the House
- Veto No. 6
- Vetoed by the Governor
- Presented to the Governor
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1621
- House concurred in Senate amendments (112-87)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On September 18, 2015 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (30-19)
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Votes (3)
September 24, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 224 PN 2180, CONCUR
September 18, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 224 PN 2180, FINAL PASSAGE
February 11, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 224 PN 214, FP
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor