+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 22, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 172
On October 16, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage
On October 14, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 23, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 808
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 779
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to COMMERCE
+ − Votes (3)
October 15, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2234 PN 3746, FINAL PASSAGE
June 18, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2234 PN 3746, FP
June 16, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2234 PN 3694, 2013 A7613, TURZAI
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor