+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (188-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Vote
October 19, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 2232 PN 3679, FP
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor