+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (198-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
July 1, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 2208 PN 3602, FP
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor