+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Vote
April 30, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2203 PN 3286, FP
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor