+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 49
- Approved by the Governor
On June 30, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 29, 2013 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: HB 22 PN 115, FINAL PASSAGE
June 18, 2013: Senate Judiciary Vote: House Bill 22 - Reported as Committed
March 19, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 22 PN 115, FP
March 12, 2013: House Judiciary Vote: House Bill 22 - Report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor