+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 4, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 145
- Approved by the Governor
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (190-3)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (184-10)
- Re-reported as committed
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Votes (3)
October 25, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 2148 PN 4064, CONCUR
October 24, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2148 PN 4064, FINAL PASSAGE
July 12, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 2148 PN 3681, FP
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor