+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On September 17, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On September 16, 2014 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1281
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On September 15, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 10, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (2)
September 17, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2134 PN 4093, FP
September 16, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2134 PN 3268, 2013 A9408, MULLERY
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor