+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 23, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 89
- Approved by the Governor
On October 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (180-1)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Amended on third consideration
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 445-446
- Third consideration and final passage (190-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
October 17, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2133 PN 3817, CONCUR
October 17, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2133 PN 3817, FINAL PASSAGE
April 17, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2133 PN 3107, FP
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor