+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 22, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 171
- Approved by the Governor
On October 16, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 14, 2014 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On October 7, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 6, 2014 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Amended on second consideration
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (5)
October 15, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2120 PN 4257, CONCUR
October 14, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2120 PN 4257, FINAL PASSAGE
June 27, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2120 PN 3862, FP
June 26, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2120 PN 3716, 2013 A7814, DELUCA
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor