+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to INSURANCE