+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 793
- Third consideration and final passage (142-52)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 221-229
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Votes (6)
May 12, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 210 PN 693, FP
February 24, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A55, MOT GERMANE, GROVE
February 24, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A57, SCHREIBER
February 24, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A152, ACOSTA
February 24, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A205, SUSP RULES, STURLA
February 24, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A188, STURLA
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor