+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 2087 PN 3469, FP
June 8, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 2087 PN 3406, 2015 A8084, KAVULICH
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor