+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Vote
May 6, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2079 PN 3118, FP
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor