+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 76
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 557-558
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2068 PN 3093, FINAL PASSAGE
May 7, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2068 PN 3093, FP
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor