+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
May 7, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2062 PN 3087, FP
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor