+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 12, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 79
- Approved by the Governor
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On October 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed in House
On October 3, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (43-5)
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 1, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On September 26, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (131-62)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-reported as amended
- Amended on Second consideration, Re-committed to Appropriations and Amended in Appropriations
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
October 3, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2060 PN 3820, FINAL PASSAGE
September 26, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2060 PN 3820, FP
September 26, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2060 PN 3820, MOT RECOM JUDICIARY, KEEFER
September 26, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2060 PN 3820, MOT POSTPONE, DUSH
June 22, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 2060 PN 3754, 2017 A7865, PETRARCA
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor