+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 8, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 23, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Vote
June 2, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2049 PN 3050, FP
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor