+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Veto No. 12
- Vetoed by the Governor
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (33-17)
- Motion for the previous question (28-22)
On September 8, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 3, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1075-1082
- Third consideration and final passage (130-71)
- Re-reported as committed
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1038-1048
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
September 9, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, MOTION FOR THE PREVIOUS QUESTION
September 9, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, FINAL PASSAGE
July 8, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, FP
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6153, KRUEGER
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6161, KRUEGER
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6149, OTTEN
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6175, KRUEGER
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6162, KRUEGER
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6148, OTTEN
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6147, KRUEGER
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor