+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 62
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to COMMERCE
+ − Votes (2)
June 10, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 2009 PN 2986, FINAL PASSAGE
May 6, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 2009 PN 2986, FP
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor